Kalberer v. American Family
Plaintiff: Jesse Kalberer
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv02278
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that 95 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file on the public docket, no later than November 12, 2014, a redacted version of the reply brief and the entirety of Exhibits 2 and 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re 81 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 47 Motion and granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Striking 52 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Discharging 17 Order to Show Cause. The Court VACATES the show cause hearing on 2/24/2014 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/202/014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 11 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit an Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 2/11/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each attorney of record in this matter to file a certification by 2/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/04/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalberer v. American Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jane Eberhardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kalberer
Represented By: Dennis M Prince
Represented By: Eric N Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?