Securities and Exchange Commission v. Malom Group AG et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Anthony B. Brandel, Sean P. Finn, Hans-Jurg Lips, M. Dwyer LLC, M.Y. Consultants, Inc., Malom Group AG, Joseph Micelli, Martin Schlaepfer and James Warras
Case Number: 2:2013cv02280
Filed: December 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 107 Warras' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 126 Brandel's Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 132 Warras' Suppl emental Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ODERED that 125 , 135 Brandel's Motions for Joinder are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, pursuant to the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 86 Defendant Warras' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 Defendant Brandel's Motion for Stay is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is ordered to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The Status and Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for December 6, 2016, at 9:15 a.m., is VACATED and CONTINUED to December 27, 2016, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 3B. 2. The clerk of the court shall send copies of this order to those listed on the docket as well as to James Warras and Anthony Brandel as specified herein. ( Electronic distribution and manual distribution pursuant to NEF and Mailed as specified herein on 11/22/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 11/22/2016 to clarify distribution per NEF (DRM).
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Sean P. Finn and M. Dwyer, LLC. re 53 MOTION for Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified docket text and added docket entry relationship on 11/2/2016 (DKJ).
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Vacate re 44 Amended Judgment. Therefore, the Amended Final Judgment is hereby VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against M.Y. Consultants, Inc. in the amount of $12,341,883.37, jointly and severally. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/9/2014. NUNC PRO TUNC DATE: 09/15/2014 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Defendant Joseph Micelli in the amount of $12,260,827.77, jointly and severally. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorneys Timothy N. England, Stephen W. Simpson, and Stephen L. Cohen. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Malom Group AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony B. Brandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean P. Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans-Jurg Lips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dwyer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.Y. Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malom Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Micelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Schlaepfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Warras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephen L Cohen
Represented By: Timothy N. England
Represented By: Stephen Simpson
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?