Knickmeyer v. State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Thomas Knickmeyer
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2014cv00231
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that 62 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Defendant State of Nevada against Plaintiff Thomas Knickmeyer.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have 14 days from entry of this judgment to file its bill of costs and motion for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that 41 defendant the State of Nevada ex rel. Eighth Judicial District Court's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant the State of Nevada ex rel. Eighth Judicial District Court shall submit an appropriate judgment consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation to Extend Time re 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/17/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the parties shall comply with LR 10-5(b) and the Ninth Circuit's opinion in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006), with respect to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that 28 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Scheduling Order Dates re 24 Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Discovery due by 3/9/2015. Motions due by 4/8/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that 7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knickmeyer v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Knickmeyer
Represented By: Kirk T Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?