Hall v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Richard Hall
Defendant: L. Adams, Romeo Aranes, James Cox, David Fierro, Catherine Masto, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven, C. Sablica and Brian E. Sandaval
Case Number: 2:2014cv00460
Filed: March 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Accepting and Adopting 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Catherine Cortez Masto be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Motion Requesting Instruction. Plaintiff must file proof of service/motion to extend time re Defendant Cortez-Masto by 8/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 35 Motion to Re-Open Discovery is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Motion to Strike Answer to the Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Court deems 21 Amended Complaint to be the operative complaint in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 33 Motion for a Status Check is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/3/115. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office and to the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Correc tions. Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this order and 4 Plaintiff's complaint on the office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, Attorney General' ;s Office shall file a notice regarding acceptance of service. if Attorney General accepts service for any named defendants, defendants shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within 60 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies provided as ordered - EDS)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Office of the Attorney General shall file a status report on on or before 8/29/2014, informing this Court of the results of the early mediation conference scheduled for 8/22/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fierro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sablica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Sandaval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?