Martel et al v Cain
Plaintiff: Valerie Martel and Marcel Pontbriand
Defendant: Dale Cain, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00636
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation of Dismissal. This Case is Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 21 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. John Benedict is substituted in place and stead of Christian Conrad Claus for plaintiffs Valerie Martel and Marcel Pontbriand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Admonishing C. Conrad Claus. ORDER Sanctioning Carl Joerger in a Court fine of $250. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that 10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martel et al v Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Cain, Sr.
Represented By: Carl M Joerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Martel
Represented By: Christian Conrad Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Pontbriand
Represented By: Christian Conrad Claus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?