Federal Trade Commission v. Ewing et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Ricki Black, Ronald Boyde, Classic Productions, LLC, Crystal A. Ewing, Global Access Management Systems, Inc., Health Nutrition Products, LLC, MBE Management, LLC, Shirley Murphy, Omni Processing Center, David Raff and Howard Raff
Case Number: 2:2014cv00683
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that 113 the Federal Trade Commission's Amended Proposed Order for Injunctive Relief is adopted in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 113 the Federal Trade Commission's proposed equitable monetary relief is adopted in full. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation re 73 Motion for Summary Judgment between the FTC and Ricki Black and order modifying the case management order solely as to those parties. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) Modified to link to stipulation on 7/23/2015 (EDS).
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation Modifying the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Withdraw 60 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 51 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/02/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Ewing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricki Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Boyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Productions, LLC
Represented By: Steven Dilibero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal A. Ewing
Represented By: Steven Dilibero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Access Management Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Nutrition Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBE Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Korin Ewing Felix
Represented By: Elsie B. Kappler
Represented By: Alejandro Rosenberg
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?