Gallagher-Kaiser Corporation v. Liberty Duct, LLC
Plaintiff: Gallagher-Kaiser Corporation
Defendant: Liberty Duct, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00869
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation to Continue Stay. Telephonic Status Conference continued to 6/3/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying 67 Stipulation for Extension of Time. The Court further ORDERS counsel for all parties (including Archer Western Contractors) to meet and confer no later than 3/21/16 regarding an appropriate schedule for this case to move forward. No later than 3/25/16, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 36 Motion to Stay. The deadlines in the Scheduling Order are further amended as follows: Discovery due by 5/13/2016. Motions due by 6/13/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 36 Motion to Stay Discovery. Any Responses due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendant's 31 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Third-Party Complaint deadline: 1/12/2016. Defendant Liberty Duct shall serve the Third-Party Complaint on Archer Western Contractors, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher-Kaiser Corporation v. Liberty Duct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallagher-Kaiser Corporation
Represented By: Cary B Domina
Represented By: Steven D Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Duct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?