Willing v. Arms et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Willing
Defendant: Arms, Health Care Partners, Martinez, Medina and Nye County Detention
Case Number: 2:2014cv01122
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 136 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 91 Motion.; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 109 Motion to Strike.; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 113 Motion for Order to Show Cause.; denying 123 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re Motions for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall have until 9/27/2016 to submit supplemental affidavits. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Martinez and Beard. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 81 Motion Requesting Summonses is Denied as moot. Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is Denied. Plaintiff's 84 Notice is construed as a motion to re-serve Defendant Deputy Greg ory Arms and is Granted. The Clerk of the Court shall re-issue summons for Defendant Arms and deliver the summons and a copy of the 69 Amended Complaint to the USM for service. The Clerk of the Court shall also mail Plaintiff a blank Form USM-285 a long with instructions for completing the form. Service must be accomplished on Defendant Arms within 45 days from the date of entry of this order, or by 04/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/03/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF:Order, amended complaint, and summons to be delivered to USM; USM-285 form and instructions sent to Plaintiff - NEV)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Denying as Moot 57 Motion to Stay Discovery. It Is Further Ordered that 59 Motion to Stay or Extend Discovery is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Discovery due by 12/21/2015. Motions due by 1/20/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2016. It Is Further Ordered that 67 Motion to Compel is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying as Moot 37 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 39 Motion for Re-Service and 49 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall file the complaint and issue summons for Defendants Gregory Arm, Nye County and Sargent Martinez. It Is Further Ordered that 48 Motion for Re-Service and 50 Motion for Required Joiner are Denied as duplicative. Proof of service due by 11/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and 52 , 53 , and 60 Motions for Production of Documents. It Is Further Ordered that 65 Motion to Strike is Granted. The Clerk of the Court Shall Strike 52 , 53 , and 60 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss. All of plaintiffs claims against Nye County Detention Center are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 5 Screening Order. Clerk shall issue Summonses for Defendants Arms, Nye County Detention, and Health Care Partners. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 20 Motion to order Defendants to reply. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Plaintiff with a required forms - SLR)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this Court Certifies that any in forma pauperis appeal from this Court's October 7, 2014, order would be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willing v. Arms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Detention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Willing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?