Barraza v. Gentry et al
Petitioner: Jessica Barraza
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada and J. Gentry
Case Number: 2:2014cv01185
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in this case is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 7 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, respondents shall, by 7/10/2017, file as an exhibit in this case a copy of the video recording of Barraza's statement to the police. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion for Transcripts at State Expense. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Extend Time re 19 Answer to Habeas Petition. Replies due by 7/29/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney General State of Nevada and J. Gentry answers due 2/9/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Petitioner shall have until 11/20/15 to respond to 10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that 4 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. Response due within 45 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall file and electronically serve 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jessica Barraza upon respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the date of this order to answer or respond to petition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: respondents - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barraza v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?