Cepero v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Billy Cepero
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian William
Case Number: 2:2014cv01396
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that denies certificate of appealability as to Petitioner's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Counsel for Petitioner's ECF No. 42 Motion to Withdraw; granting Petitioner's ECF No. 43 Motion to Place Pro Se Documents on the Docket; vacating the Court's ECF No. 41 Order striking t hree pro se motions; denying Petitioner's ECF No. 34 Motion for Reconsideration; denying Petitioner's ECF No. 36 Motion to Present Additional Supporting Evidence; granting nunc pro tunc Petitioner's ECF No. 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that Petitioner's pro se motion for reconsideration ECF No. 34 , motion to present additional supporting evidence ECF No. 36 , and motion for extension of time ECF No. 39 be stricken as fugitive documents. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ECF No. 22 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss; petition is dismissed with prejudice; a certificate of appealability is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Strike; striking as a fugitive document ECF No. 28 Motion for Court to direct NDOC to provide recordings; granting nunc pro tunc motion for extension of time ECF No. 24 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Petitioner's motion to reopen this action (ECF No. 15 ) is granted. The stay is lifted by this order, the Clerk will reopen the file in this action. Clerk will detach and file the first-amended petition (ECF No. 15 -1). Answer/respon se to first-amended petition due by 11/17/2016. Any additional state court record exhibits filed must be filed with an index as specified herein. The parties must send courtesy copies of all exhibits to the Reno Clerk's Office, and directed to the attention of "Staff Attorney". Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a motion to reopen the case (ECF No. 14 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that 6 Motion for Issuance of Stay and Abeyance is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is stayed pending final resolution of petitioner's po stconviction habeas petition. FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner returning to federal court with a motion to reopen the case within forty-five (45) days of the issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Ne vada, at the conclusion of the state court proceedings on the postconviction habeas petition. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall administratively close this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. The Clerk shall file and electronically serve the petition upon respondents. Petitioner shall have 30 days to show cause and file such proof he may have to demonstrate t hat his appeal before the Nevada Supreme Court has been decided. if petitioner is unable to demonstrate that he has exhausted his state remedies, the Court will enter an order dismissing the petition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepero v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Cepero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?