Cepero v. William et al
Petitioner: Billy Cepero
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian William
Case Number: 2:2014cv01397
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot 35 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion; ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion to Amend/Correct; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 27 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; ORDER denying 26 Motion to Extend Time; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Address Listed on Order - JM) Modified on 11/14/2017 (JM).
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER striking 22 Motion to Compel; granting 23 Motion to Strike. Case Dismissed with prejudice. Certificate of Appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 10 Motion to Stay Proceedings is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner has until July 20, 2015, to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action as untimely. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying 8 Motion to Stay. Amended Petition due by 1/15/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk of the court shall file the petition. Amended Petition due within 30 days. Notice of Appearance due within 20 days. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Petitioner with required forms and AG - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepero v. William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Cepero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?