First 100, LLC et al v. Lasala et al
Plaintiff: 1st One-Hundred Holdings, LLC and First 100, LLC
Defendant: Cha Solutions Inc., Cornwall Capital Management LP, Ian Haft, John Lasala and Jaime Mai
Case Number: 2:2014cv01460
Filed: September 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 105 Motion for Attorney Fees, 106 Bill of Costs (First Request). Responses due by 11/3/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JUDGMENT in favor of 1st One-Hundred Holdings, LLC and First 100, LLC and against John Lasala. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's 87 Motion to Dismiss and 88 Motion for Liquidated Damages are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John Lasala must attend the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Marquis Aurbach Coffing must serve a copy of 39 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant as well as this Order on Defendant John Lasala and file proof of service by 2/12/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 5 Motion to Declare Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order Void is DENIED as Moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 18 Countermotion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file a response brief with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First 100, LLC et al v. Lasala et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st One-Hundred Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Represented By: Ashley G Hanks
Represented By: Margaret Schmidt
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First 100, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Represented By: Ashley G Hanks
Represented By: Margaret Schmidt
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cha Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornwall Capital Management LP
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Haft
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lasala
Represented By: Adam C Anderson
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Mai
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?