Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Nevada Title Company
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporate
Defendant: Nevada Title Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv01567
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation. Settlement Conference reset for 6/27/2017 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2017 Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: FDIC's motion for summary judgment 41 and Nevada Title's motion for summary judgment 42 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation re 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 9/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Expert Disclosure Only. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/12/2015. Motions due by 12/11/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time. Discovery due by 9/12/2015. Motions due by 10/12/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Nevada Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporate
Represented By: Randolph L. Howard
Represented By: Shlomo S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?