Colleran v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Bridget K. Colleran
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2014cv01736
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 24 the Report and Recommendation be ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full, to the extent that it is not inconsistent with this Order. IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is GRANTED and this ca se is hereby REMANDED to the Administrative Law Judge. The Clerk of Court shall remand this case back to the Administrative Law Judge and thereafter close this Court's case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 the Commissioner's Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 the Commissioner's Cross-Motion to Affirm is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 27 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Reply to Objections re 24 Report and Recommendation. Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the complaint, issue summons, and serve the Commissioner of Social Security Administration via certified mail. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colleran v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget K. Colleran
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?