Matthews-Orta v. Holder et al
Plaintiff: Raul Matthews-Orta
Defendant: F.O.D. Steven M. Branch, Anthony L De Meo, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto
Case Number: 2:2014cv01853
Filed: November 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Dismissing Petition for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that the petition is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction over the subject matter. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's emergency motion for stay 4 is DENIED as m oot. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents motion to dismiss 17 is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' motion to seal their answer to the petition and opposition to motion to stay 22 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 4 Motion to Stay. Response due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to permit appearance of government attorney, W. Manning Evans to practice before the court in this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking 2 Motion for Hearing; striking 3 Motion for Scheduling Order; The Clerk of Court SHALL SERVE 1 the petition and 4 emergency motion for a stay of deportation, along with this order, upon the respondents. Respondents SHALL F ILE AND SERVE an answer or other response to 1 petition and 4 the emergency motion for a stay of deportation with 15 days of the date of this order. Petitioner SHALL FILE AND SERVE a reply to respondents' answer or response to the petition and response to the motion for a stay of deportation within 10 days of the date that petitioner is served. (See order for specific details.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews-Orta v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.O.D. Steven M. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L De Meo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Matthews-Orta
Represented By: Benson Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?