MedCapGroup, LLC v. Mesa Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: MedCapGroup, LLC
Defendant: Mesa Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01864
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Stipulated/Consent Judgment in favor of MedCapGroup, LLC and against Mesa Pharmacy, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation of Dismissal re: Third and Fourth Party Complaints. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's Order and Findings and Recommendation regarding the enforcement of the settlement agreement 83 is ADOPTED in its entirety. Plaintiffs Objection/Appeal of that document 86 is OVERRULED/ DENIED. Plaintif fs Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, Motion for Sanctions, and Motion for Attorneys Fees 58 is DENIED.This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Foley for another settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Dave Brown and against Fourth-Party Defendant Medcare Finance, LLC as follows: Medcare must indemnify Brown for any liability in this case, consistent with Browns first claim for relief; and should Brown be held l iable in this case, Brown is entitled to the protections of Nevada law limiting the liability of a member of a limited liability company. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 84 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED. Medcare's 87 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations are OVERRULED. Dave Brown's 53 Motion for Default Judgment Again st Fourth-Party Defendant Medcare Finance, LLC is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Brown and against fourth-party defendant Medcare (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 48 Request to Clerk to Enter Default on Fourth-party Defendant Greg L. Sundem is DENIED without prejudice to Brown's ability to file a renewed motion for default that demonstrates that Sundem was properly served. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Third-Party Defendant Dave Brown's and Defendant Praxsyn, Inc., formerly known as Mesa Pharmacy, Inc.'s 28 Joint Motion to Extend Time re Discovery. Discovery due by 1/7/2016. Motions due by 2/6/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that Mr. West shall update his information in the case file and on the CM/ECF system no later than five (5) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re the parties' failure to file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 3/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Attorney Ryan R. West shall have 14 days to file the address of his local office or to comply with Local Rule IA 10-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendant shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties by 1/8/2015. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedCapGroup, LLC v. Mesa Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedCapGroup, LLC
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?