Rollsroller Enterprise, Inc. et al v. CWT Worktools AB
Plaintiff: Rollsroller AB and Rollsroller Enterprise, Inc.
Defendant: CWT Worktools AB
Case Number: 2:2014cv01921
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Stay Deadlines for Thirty Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines. Motions due by 1/27/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Protective Order filed by CWT Worktools AB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 23 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer and submit a revised Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order on or before August 10, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollsroller Enterprise, Inc. et al v. CWT Worktools AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWT Worktools AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollsroller AB
Represented By: Michael E Crawford
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Alan M. Kagen
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Robert A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollsroller Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Crawford
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Alan M. Kagen
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Robert A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?