Jones v. State of Nevada ex rel Board of Regents for the Nevada System of Higher Education
Plaintiff: Dr Francis Jones
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel Board of Regents for the Nevada System of Higher Education
Case Number: 2:2014cv01930
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Remove Attorney Debra L. Pieruschka from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. It is Hereby Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed the time to file Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and Amend Order 31 Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting 33 Defendant's Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline to 10/24/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants' motion to amend the scheduling order 25 is GRANTD.Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 12 is DENIED and defendant's motion for summary judgment 18 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court enter judgment in favor of theDefendants and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State of Nevada ex rel Board of Regents for the Nevada System of Higher Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr Francis Jones
Represented By: Christopher L Marchand
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel Board of Regents for the Nevada System of Higher Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?