GenX Processors Mauritius Limited v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: GenX Processors Mauritius Limited
Defendant: Matthew J Jackson and Symmetric Systems LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01938
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation to Extend Time. Show Cause Hearing reset for 3/12/2019 at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Continue Re: 65 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Motion Hearing reset for 2/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 58 Plaintiff Genx Processors Mauritius Limited's Motion to Compel Responses to Subpoenas and Attorney Fees and 60 Motion to Exceed Pages are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Charged Entities must fully respond to Plaintiff's subpoenas and produce the requested discovery on or before 11/26/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 37 the plaintiff's motion for interest is GRANTED. The plaintiff is awarded pre-judgment interest in the amount of $72,250.36. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff is awarded post-judgment interest from 4 /12/17 until paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter an amended judgment to include the original judgment amount of $555,576.19 (ECF No. 35), plus prejudgment interest awarded herein of $72,250.36, plus costs previously taxed in the amount of $846.78 (ECF No. 38). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Proceed in Aid of Execution Requiring Judgment Debtor's Appearance Before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff GenX Processors and Mauritius Limited and against defendant Symmetric Systems, Inc. in the amount of $555,576.19. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. GenX shall file proposed amended complaint within 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Judgment is hereby entered against Jackson and Symmetric, jointly and severally, in favor of the Plaintiff in the amount of 555,576.19. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GenX Processors Mauritius Limited v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GenX Processors Mauritius Limited
Represented By: Aaron Ray Dean
Represented By: Glen Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symmetric Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?