Branch Banking And Trust Company v. Rad et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking And Trust Company
Defendant: R. Phillip Nourafchan and Saiid Forouzan Rad
Case Number: 2:2014cv01947
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Branch Banking And Trust Company against The Estate of Saiid Forouzan, Akbar Rastgoo Damavandi, R. Phillip Nourafchan. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion Charging Judgment Debtor Membership Interest in RPN LLC and Judgment Debtor the Estate of Saiid Forouzan Rad and Akbar Ragstoo Damavandi's Stock in Forouzan, Inc. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT in favor of Branch Banking And Trust Company against The Estate of Saiid Forouzan, Akbar Rastgoo Damavandi, R. Phillip Nourafchan. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment with regard to BB&T's breach of claim in the amount $44,517,158.59 of 10/1/2015. BB&T shall submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified to include monetary amount on 9/2/2016 (EDS).
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Defendants' 39 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 9 Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 9/23/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File Motion to Substitute Party. Motions due by 11/2/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/17/2015. Motions due by 10/16/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Proceedings Against Saiid Forouzan Rad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking And Trust Company v. Rad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking And Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: J. Stephen Peek
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Phillip Nourafchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saiid Forouzan Rad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?