Arthur v. Neven et al
Petitioner: George Chester Arthur
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Neven
Case Number: 2:2014cv02083
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Extend Time re 28 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner will have through 8/26/19, to file a reply to 58 the answer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Extend Time Re: 28 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Reply due 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Extend Time Re: 58 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition re 28 Amended Petition. Replies due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Extend Time, and the time for respondents to file an answer to the first amended petition is extended up to and including 2/25/19. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 51 Respondents' original motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that 52 Respondents' amended motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that Respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 48 respondents' unopposed motion for court to issue briefing schedule is GRANTED. Petitioner will have ninety (90) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve Exhibits 71, 73, 75, 76, 78, 83, 93, and 104. Respondents will have thirty (30) days from the date of service of those exhibits to file and serve an answer or other response to 28 the first amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 45 respondents' motion for extension of time (second request) is GRANTED. Respondents will have through 12/20/17, to respond to 28 the amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Extend Time re 28 First AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents answer due 11/20/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 27 petitioner's motion to lift stay is GRANTED. The clerk of the court shall reopen this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 petitioner's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 petitioner's motion to partially waive local rule IA 10-3(e) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to 28 the first amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 19 Motion for an Extension of Time (Second Request). First amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 12/31/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner need not pay any further filing fees ($5.00). Petitioner's 2 and 4 Motions to Appoint Counsel are Granted. The Federal Pub lic Defender is provisionally appointed to represent Petitioner. The Federal Public Defender has 30 days from the date that this Order is entered to undertake direct representation of Petitioner or to indicate to the court his inability to represe nt Petitioner in these proceedings. The clerk shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for Respondents. The hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forwarded to the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Petitioner's 10 Motion to have the Petition marked as Filed is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Petitioner - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Chester Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?