Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. D.R. Horton, Inc.
Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02222
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting 269 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third-Party Complaint; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 261 Stipulation to Deem Settlement Agreement and for Dismissal of Third-Party Defendant Bebout Concrete, Inc. with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 258 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to D.R. Horton, Inc.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 239 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Majestic Plumbing, Inc.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 237 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Distinctive Marble, Inc.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 222 Sunrise's motion for determination of good faith settlement be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 227 Bebout's motion for determination of good faith settlement be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 228 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third Party Defendant American Asphalt & Grading Company; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 225 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ISI Design and Installation Solutions, Inc.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 220 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third Party Defendant Harrison Landscape Company, LLC; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 209 Stipulation to Deem Settlement Agreement and for Dismissal of Third-Party Gilmore Construction, LLC with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 178 Motion; ORDER granting 182 Motion; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 206 Stipulation to Deem the Settlement Agreement and Release Executed by Third-Party Defendant; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 202 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third-Party Defendant Quality Wood Products, Ltd.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 198 Stipulation re Settlement Agreement; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 192 Motion to Dismiss to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Efficient Enterprises, Inc.; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER. Defendant New Creation Masonry, Inc, is hereby ORDERED to file a notice of changed address by 5/30/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 162 Motion; ORDER granting 167 Motion; ORDER granting 168 Motion; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re: 68 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Hearing set for 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Compel; Status Report due by 9/25/2017. The Court ORDERS the parties to schedule and hold a N.R.S. § 40.680 Mediation no later than October 25, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 5 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk shall stay this case pending notice from the parties that the Chapter 40 pre-litigation requirements have been met. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that 13 Motion for Rule 60 relief is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall reopen this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file response re 6 Motion to Dismiss within 14 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs 1 complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Denying as moot 5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. D.R. Horton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Represented By: Scott P Kelsey
Represented By: Anna Mirijanian
Represented By: Paul P. Terry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Anthony S Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?