Guevara v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Plaintiff: Wilmer Guevara
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2015cv00008
Filed: January 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. (Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/12/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying 29 LVMPD's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines 12 . (First Request) New Deadlines: Discovery cut-off: 10/19/2015; Amending Pleadings or Adding Parties: 7/21/2015; Expert Disclosures: 8/20/2015; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 9/18/2015; Dispositive Motions: 11/18/2015; Interim Status Report: 8/20/2015; and Proposed Joint Pretrial Order: 12/17/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/29/2015) (PS).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Guevara
Represented By: Adam Levine
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?