Vontress v. Nevens et al
Plaintiff: George Leslie Vontress
Defendant: Chilton Leach, Cole Morrow, D.W. Nevens, Portillo and Duane Wilson
Case Number: 2:2015cv00060
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically sere a copy of this order and a copy of 6 Amended Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Order Dismissing Case and 8 Clerk's Judgment are vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the the Clerk of the Court shall reopen this ca se. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is reinstated and is the operative application to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court will screen 6 First Amended Complaint in a separate order at a later date. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice based on Plaintiffs failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with this courts May 19, 2015, order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that 1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vontress v. Nevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Nevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Leslie Vontress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?