Azefor v. DePuy Orthopedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Herman Azefor
Defendant: DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00192
Filed: February 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 57 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 08/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Motion to Withdraw - Attorneys Richard Wright, Douglas Dellaccio Jr., and Richard A. Harris terminated; directing Clerk to add Plaintiff's last known address to docket and to serve him with a copy of this orde r (mailed 8/9/2016); setting a Status Conference for 8/22/2016 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying Defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/03/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Stay Response to Complaint and Discovery. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azefor v. DePuy Orthopedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Azefor
Represented By: Douglas A Dellaccio
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Richard A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?