Kielty v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
John R Kielty |
Defendant: |
American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC, Joel B Edralin, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00230 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 24, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting ECF No. 82 Motion to Reconsider; denying ECF Nos. 81 , 85 Motions for Summary Judgment; granting ECF No. 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; giving Defendants 14 days to submit a proposed form of judgment or a notice of what remains to be litigated in this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
67
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 38 , 46 , and 53 Motions for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 35 Motion to Consolidate Cases is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
55
ORDER re Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage and Intervenor's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment and 48 Motion to Stay, and Counter Defendant Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Associa tion, Inc.'s 53 Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT is set for 2/12/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
November 17, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for November 30, 2015 at 3:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
30
ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery isstayed in this matter until September 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Stay. Discovery shall be stayed until an order has been issued on the motions for summary judgment in Case No. 2:14-cv-01975-GMN-NJK, Case No. 2:14-cv-01999-GMN-NJK, Case No. 2:14-cv-02038- GMN-PAL, and in Case No. 2:14-cv-02038-GMN-PAL. The parties shall promptly notify the Court in this case of the decisions on the foregoing motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?