Hardan v. Nye County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Hardan
Defendant: Sheriff Anthony L. Demeo, Officer Cory Fowles, Assistant Sheriff Richard Marshall, Lieutenant Mark Medina and Nye County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2015cv00470
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that: The 54 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. The clerk of the court shall serve the plaintiff with a copy of this order at her last known address. The 53 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, to the extent the case is stayed until 12 /13/2017. A mandatory settlement conference is set for 9:30 a.m., 2/21/2018. A separate order will be entered with specific instructions for the settlement conference. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 36 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pa rties shall file their Joint Pretrial Order by 10/27/2017. Additionally, pursuant to District of Nevada Local Rule 16-5, this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen for a settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Defendants' 50 Motion for Exception of Attendance Requirement at the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Extend Dispositive Motions by Plaintiff Melissa Hardan. Motions due by 9/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 9 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/10/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardan v. Nye County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Anthony L. Demeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cory Fowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Sheriff Richard Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Mark Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hardan
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?