Cram

Plaintiff: Barbara Ruth Cram
Case Number: 2:2015cv00540
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and Adjudged that this action is Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 24, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot ECF No. 63 Motion to Extend Time; denying as moot 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and granting ECF NO. 67 Motion to Request Acceptance of Amendment to Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 9, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Barbara Ruth Crams request for an additional 30 days to file a complaint is GRANTED. Ms. Cram must file a complaint, along with the applicable filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis, within 30 days of the date of this order. All other requests in Ms. Crams letter are DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to Ms. Cram a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis (short form) as well as the document titled Information and Instructions for Filing a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 23, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that a complaint, along with applicable filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis is due in 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ruth Cram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?