Gill v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Tammy A. Gill
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2015cv00553
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 26 the report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hoffman be, and the same hereby are, ADOPTED in their entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 plaintiff's motion for reversal or r emand be, and the same hereby is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 the commissioner's cross-motion to affirm be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension (Third Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm. (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Extend Time to file Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm (First Request). Cross-Motion to Affirm due 10/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summon s and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. From this point forward, Plaintiff shall serv e upon Defendant or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon the attorney, a copy of every pleading, motion or other document submitted for consideration by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: April Angelina Alongi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy A. Gill
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?