Branch Banking And Trust Company v. Hammer et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking And Trust Company
Defendant: Big Investors, LLC and James Hammer
Case Number: 2:2015cv00573
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Stipulation for dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TEMPORARILY UNSEALING TRANSCRIPT : IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that the portion of the sealed recording shall be unsealed by the Clerk for the limited purpose of providing transcript of hearing as requested by defendants' counse l. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sealed portion of the recording shall thereafter be resealed by the Clerk until further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' counsel shall not disclose the sealed contents of transcript to anyone other than the representatives of the parties directly concerned with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's ECF No. 20 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' ECF No. 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Service by Publication. Order Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time for Service. The Court hereby extends the time for Plaintiff to serve Defendants, pursuant to FRCP 4(m), by 90 days to 10/26/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking And Trust Company v. Hammer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking And Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Jeremy J. Nork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?