Nevada Sand Castle, LLC v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nevada Sand Castle, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Green Tree Servicing LLC, PRLAP, Inc. and ReconTrust Company, N.A..
Case Number: 2:2015cv00588
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Time to File an Appeal is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 70 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul R.M. Cullen and Robert B. Noggle terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gregory Bean terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors are granted summary judgment on all of Plaintiff's claims and Intervenors' counterclaims. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 10:30 a.m.,1/16/17 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m., 1/17/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Stay. Status Conference set for 1/16/2017 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 39 Stipulation. Responses due by 8/3/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 45 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Yan Xiong Li. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Opposition due by 8/3/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., May 27, 2016, in Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 05/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Consolidate (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation Permitting Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency, as conservator of the Federal National Mortgage Association, to Intervene. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Answer and Countercla ims by proposed Intervenors Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency, As Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association must be filed on or before 1/21/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to File First Amended Answer to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Sand Castle, LLC v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: YanXiong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLAP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company, N.A..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Sand Castle, LLC
Represented By: Paul R.M. Cullen
Represented By: Robert B. Noggle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?