Green Tree Servicing LLC v. NV Eagles, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: NV Eagles, LLC and Shadow Springs Community Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00590
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 109 Intervenor-Plaintiff's FHFA's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 113 Plaintiff Green Tree Servicing LLC (Ditech)'s Motion for Summary Judgment on tender, and 120 D efendant Shadow Springs Community Association's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 100 the parties' Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall substitute Joseph Y. Hong, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendant NV Eagles, LLC in the place of John H. Wright, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 85 Motion to Dismiss ; by Intervenor Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency. Responses due by 10/31/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Intervene. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation. 31 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Replies due by 3/28/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation re 31 Motion for Summary Judgment and 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. NV Eagles, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Eagles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadow Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?