5035 Village Trust v. Durazo et al
Plaintiff: 5035 Village Trust
Defendant: Xavier F Durazo, Andrea T Garnica and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Counter Defendant: 5035 Village Trust
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Counter Claimant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: Winterwood Village Unit No. 1, Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00747
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ( Responses due by 11/28/2016., Replies due by 12/19/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a proposed discovery plan no later than May 23, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Stay. In the event that resolution of the 62 Motion to Consolidate does not result in the termination of this case, the parties shall file a proposed discovery plan within 7 days of the issuance of that order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro because she is presiding over related case Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al, 2:15-cv-1338-GMN-CWH. Chief Judge Navarro will determine whether to consolidate the cases. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation of Dismissal. Green Tree Servicing LLC's third-party claims against defendant Winterwood Ranch Unit No. 1 Homeowners Association are DISMISSED without prejudice. It Is Further Ordered that 40 Motion to Dismiss is Denied without Prejudice and as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5035 Village Trust v. Durazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: 5035 Village Trust
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5035 Village Trust
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier F Durazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea T Garnica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: YanXiong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: YanXiong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: YanXiong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Winterwood Village Unit No. 1, Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?