Moser v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Moser
Defendant: Kristen Beck, Eldorado Resorts Corporation, James Grimes, Michael Marrs, Bruce Polansky and Dominic Taleghani
Case Number: 2:2015cv00757
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Stipulation of Dismissal; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall comply with LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's opinion in Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006), and the CM/ECF filing instructions stated herein with respect to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER for Status and Scheduling Conference. A status and scheduling conference is RESET for 2:00 p.m., September 4, 2015, in Las Vegas Courtroom 3B before the Honorable Peggy A. Leen and the Honorable George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Status and Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen and Magistrate Judge George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moser v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Taleghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Moser
Represented By: Brian S. Letofsky
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?