Buhecker et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Evon Buhecker, William Douglas, Roberto Franche, Brenda Palmer, John Palmer, Marvin Pope and Bryan Wisner
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00769
Filed: April 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that Trevor Hatfield shall, not later than seven days from date of this Order, file a document identifying the name and address of mediator. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that the 99 Motion to Deny Notice of Amended Attorney's Lien and 100 Motion for Release of Funds Not in Dispute to Plaintiffs are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Adopting the 92 Report and Recommendation. Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s 80 Motion to Deposit Funds or Interplead Settlement Funds with the Court is Granted. Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. may deposit the amount of $10,000.00 with the Clerk of the Court and must deposit the funds not later than Friday, May 12, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Motion to Extend Time (First Request) to File Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Deadline: 2/17/2017. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that the Court Adopts the 67 Report and Recommendation. Defendant Delta Airline, Inc.'s 57 Motion to Enforce Settlement is Granted. Defendant Delta Airline, Inc.'s 40 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is Denied without prejudice as moot. The Parties shall file a Stipulation and Order for Dismissal not later than 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Substitute Attorney for plaintiff Daniel Watanabe. Attorney Trevor J. Hatfield terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant's 57 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement is scheduled for 3:00 p.m., October 24, 2016, in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting Defendant's 58 Motion to Extend Time re Dispositive Motion Deadline (First Request). Deadline extended 30 days after the Court has ruled on 57 Motion to Enforce Settlement and/or 40 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on the 51 Substitution of Counsel is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., September 30, 2016, in Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that James C. Malcolm must attend the hearing. Plaintiff's counsel must forward a copy of this Order to Mr. Malcolm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation re 40 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/20/2016. Replies due by 7/1/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Defendant's 42 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing re 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (First Request). Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2016 at 10:00 is Vacated and rescheduled to 6/21/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss. The First Amended Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint until 5/13/2016. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The Court hereby ADMONISHES Plaintiffs Pope and Fernandez for their non-appearance at the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference scheduled on 12/10/2015. Plaintiffs Pope and Fernandez are warned that future failure to comply with Court orders or applicable rules may result in the imposition of severe sanctions, up to and including dismissal of their claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Relief from Early Neutral Evaluation. The Motion fails to indicate whether Mr. Buhecker could attend telephonically in the event the Court excuses his personal appearance. Plaintiff shall file a statement so indicating no later than noon on 12/3/2015. Any response to the 18 Motion must be filed no later than noon on 12/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/13/2015. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buhecker et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evon Buhecker
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Douglas
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Franche
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Palmer
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Palmer
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Pope
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Wisner
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?