Southern Highlands Community Association v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Southern Highlands Community Association
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00776
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting ECF No. 76 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Conor P. Flynn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Defendant shall submit documents MIC00427, MIC02303, MIC00640, MIC00776, MIC00777, MIC00449, and MIC00450 directly to this Court's chambers for in camera review no later than Monday, October 26, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall submit the documents requested in a binder with tabs and label each document so it is easily identifiable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Highlands Community Association v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Conor P. Flynn
Represented By: Kevin R Stolworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?