Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, Southern Highlands Community Association and Terraza Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00813
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Re: 110 Order on Motion for Summary Judgments. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 83 SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, 82 Association's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and 84 Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 86 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 82 , 83 , and 84 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/3/2019. Replies due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steven T. Loizzi, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the st ay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation. Reply due 8/29/2016 re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response due 8/29/2016 re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation And Order To Extend Deadline for Dispositive Motions And Pretrial Order (First Request). Motions due by 8/1/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Terraza Homeowners Association Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to 9 Erraza Homeowners Association's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/25/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Complaint. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC answer due 6/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation for a Two Week Extension to File Response to 1 Complaint. Southern Highlands Community Association answer due 6/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Seetal Tejura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraza Homeowners Association
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Chad Daniel Fuss
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association
Represented By: Andrew M. Jacobs
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp, Pvt
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?