The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: J. Jeffrey Dill, Linda E Patterson and Michael Glen Patterson
Case Number: 2:2015cv00892
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiff Lincoln National Life Insurance Company Only, with each party bearing their own costs, attorneys' fees and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Unopposed Joint Motion to Set Aside Order of Dismissal. Pursuant to the instant Joint Motion, the Court's 20 Stipulated Dismissal Order is set aside. The parties in this case will have until 04/19/2016, to file an amended Stipulation of Dismissal in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 04/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jeffrey Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda E Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glen Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Dreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?