Torno v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Torno
Defendant: Fannie Mae, National Default Servicing Corporation and Premier American Title Agency, Inc.
702) 792-9002 (fax: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01018
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. Settlement documents are due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties either: 1) file a stipulation dismissing this action with prejudice; or 2) file a joint status report regarding settlement within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties either: 1) file a stipulation dismissing this action with prejudice; or 2) file a joint status report regarding settlement within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 136 Stipulation to Extend Time. Motions due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting 129 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery (First Request). Discovery due by 2/22/2018. Motions due by 3/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 125 the Substitution of Attorney is GRANTED. Amy F. Sorenson, Robin E. Perkins and V.R. Bohman of Snell & Wilmer, LLP are substituted in the place of Jacob Bundick, Jennifer Gray, Leslie Godfrey, Tami Cowden, Michael Hog ue and Mark Ferrario of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, for defendants Green Tree Servicing, LLP and Federal National Mortgage Association, LLC subject to the provisions of LR IA 10-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Leoncio A Gil, III withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 105 defendant National Default Servicing Corporation's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. National Default Servicing Corporation is dismissed as a party to this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 70 the defendants' motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Schedule. Magistrate Judge Leen will address discovery deadlines after a decision on the pending Motion for Class Certification is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 113 Stipulation Extending Time to File re 98 MOTION to Certify Class, 105 MOTION to Dismiss re 97 Third Amended Complaint. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 111 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Ms. Torno to file her reply in support of 98 the Motion for Class Certification is hereby extended from 5/26/17 to 6/9/17. The deadline for Ms. Torno to file her response to 105 the National Default Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended from 5/26/17 to 6/9/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 109 Stipulation Extending Time. The deadline for Ms. Torno to file her reply in support of 98 the Motion for Class Certification is hereby extended from 5/12/17 to 5/2617. The deadline for Ms. Torno to file her response to 105 the National Default Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended from 5/10/17 to 5/26/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including Wednesday, 4/26/17 to file any Opposition to 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. Additionally, Plaintiff's deadline to file her Reply to her Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel shall be extended to Friday, 5/12/17. Additionally, Defendants shall have up to and including Wednesday, 4/26/17 to file any response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Stipulation Extending Time re 98 MOTION to Certify Class. (Responses due by 4/19/2017., Replies due by 5/5/2017.) Defendants answer due 4/19/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 74 Motion for Leave. IT IS ORDERED that Ms. Torno's deadline to file a reply brief in support of her 74 Motion for Leave is extended forty-five (45) days, from 12/23/16 to 2/6/17 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on 74 the Motion for Leave is RESET from 1/10/17,at 10:30 a.m., to 2/14/17, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 78 the Motion for Sanctions is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 89 the Stipulation to Extend Time is GRANTED to the extent that: a. Plaintiff shall have until 1/13/17, to file her reply to 74 the Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ; b. Green Tree shall have until 1/ 13/17, to file is response to 78 the Motion for Sanctions Regarding Discovery ; and Plaintiff shall have until 1/20/17, to file her reply to 78 the Motion for Sanctions Regarding Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on these Motions 74 , 78 currently set for 1/10/17, isVACATED and CONTINUED to 1/31/17, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation Extending Time re 78 MOTION for Sanctions re Discovery Against Green Tree Servicing, LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2)(A).( Responses due by 12/15/2016., Replies due by 12/30/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' have to and including 11/21/16 to Reply to 70 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike the Class Allegations and Respond to 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Le ave to File Third Amended Complaint. Additionally, Plaintiff's Reply to their 74 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint shall be extended to 12/9/16; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on 11/29/16 re 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is HEREBY RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m. on 1/10/17. The Motion for Sanctions 78 shall also be heard on that date and time as well. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulation re 70 MOTION to Strike 1 Petition for Removal. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Status Conference reset for 11/17/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation Extending Time to File Reply in Support of Joint Status Report/Motion to Compel 38 and 62 . Replies due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER lifting stay, directing the parties to meet and confer to discuss case management plan, and setting a status and scheduling hearing for 6/30/2016 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff Crystal Torno to file her Response to Defendants 33 Motion to Stay. The deadline for Ms. Torno to file her response to the Motion to Stay is hereby extended from 12/21/15 to 12/24/15. The deadline for Fannie Mae and Green Tree to file a reply brief is 1/6/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Reply. Defendants shall have to and including 12/10/15, to file their replies to:Plaintiffs Response to 20 Defendant Fannie Maes Motion to Dissolve Injunction; Plaintiffs Respon se to: Defendants 21 Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Fannie Maes Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings; and Defendants 23 Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Fannie Maes Request For Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torno v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Tami D. Cowden
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Matthew D. Dayton
Represented By: Kevin S. Soderstrom
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier American Title Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 792-9002 (fax: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Tami D. Cowden
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Torno
Represented By: Bailey Kennedy LLP
Represented By: George Haines
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?