Sekkat v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ali Sekkat
Defendant: Kristen Beck, Eldorado Resorts Corporation, James Grimes, Michael Marrs, Bruce Polansky and Dominic Taleghani
Case Number: 2:2015cv01029
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that the scheduling conference set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED and CONTINUED to 7/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Third Request) re 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/8/2017. Replies due by 6/7/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation To Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions and Responses and Replies Thereto. ( Motions due by 3/16/2017., Responses due by 4/17/2017., Replies due by 5/17/2017. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the parties shall comply with LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's opinion in Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006), and the CM/ECF filing instructions with respect to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER. A Status and Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/4/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen and the Honorable George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that a Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 8/13/2015 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen and the Honorable George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekkat v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Taleghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Ali Sekkat
Represented By: Brian S. Letofsky
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?