Parr v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Marcella Parr
Defendant: Kristen Beck, Eldorado Resorts Corporation, James Grimes, Michael Marrs, Bruce Polansky and Dominic Taleghani
Case Number: 2:2015cv01030
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Third Request). Motions due by 5/8/2017. Replies due by 6/7/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to extend time to file dispositive motions (first request) re 44 Scheduling Order. Motions due by 3/16/2017; Responses due by 4/17/2017; and Replies due by 5/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/28/2016.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall comply with LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's opinion in Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006), and the CM/ECF filing instructions stated herein with respect to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER for Status and Scheduling Conference. A status and scheduling conference is RESET for 2:00 p.m., September 4, 2015, in Las Vegas Courtroom 3B before the Honorable Peggy A. Leen and the Honorable George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Status and Scheduling Conference. A status and scheduling conference is set for 9:00 a.m., August 13, 2015, in Las Vegas Courtroom 3A before the Honorable Peggy A. Leen and the Honorable George A. Foley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parr v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Taleghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Parr
Represented By: Brian S. Letofsky
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?