Luna v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jose R. Luna
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv01104
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 38 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that ECF No. 33 Motion to Remand is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/04/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Motion to Reconsider; amending in part ECF No. 24 Order and granting ECF No. 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART # 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Oral Argument re 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is set for 4/15/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying without prejudice 12 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a revised Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 8/4/2015 that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Luna
Represented By: Christian Morris
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?