HSBC Bank National Association v. Stratford Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank National Association
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Stratford Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv01259
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Shu Qiong Xu. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Stipulation of Dismissal as to all claims by and between HSBC Bank National Association, as trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust 2014-12, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC in t his action are DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. SFR has until March 1, 2021, to file its renewed motion for default judgment against any remaining party. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that by 2/12/2021 the parties must file either dismissal documents or a joint status report indicating the status of settlement and how or if the Court can assist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing re 112 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement conference statement deadline and conference are VACATED. Dismissal documents or Status Report due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that HSBC Bank's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 97 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. SFR's 95 Application for Default Jud gment against Shu Qiong Xu is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the magistrate judge for amandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation to Lift Stay. The parties will file their proposed discovery plan and scheduling order within 21 days after the entry of the order lifting the stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N. Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 66 Motion to Lift Stay is Denied without prejudice to the filing of a new motion after the Supreme Court rules on the Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay petitions for certiorari review. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the stay. Until that time, all pro ceedings in this action are stayed. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 49 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED and 50 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Discharging Obligations under the Order to Show Cause Why this Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Want of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. The parties' obligations under the 38 Order to Show Cause are deemed to have been discharged. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing HSBC's second and third claims for relief. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 2/8/2016. Motions due by 3/9/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. SFR's counterclaims against U.S. Bank National Association as Dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate U.S. Bank as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank National Association v. Stratford Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank National Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratford Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?