Connors v. Williams, Sr. et al
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Petitioner: Timothy Wayne Connors
Case Number: 2:2015cv01351
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 135 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/5/2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting 131 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E. Williams, Sr. answer due 5/23/2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting ECF No. 129 Motion to Extend Time. Response re ECF No. 124 is extended to April 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time to FileSecond-Amended Petition. Amended Petition due by 1/8/2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Reopen Case, Directing Petitioner to File Second Amended Petition, and Scheduling Order. Second Amended Petition due by 12/9/2023. respondents will then have 45 days after service of the second-amended petition t o file a response to it. Petitioner will then have 45 days from service of that response to file a reply or opposition. Any other motions will be subject to the normal briefing schedule under the local rules. Case reopened. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 98 the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Exercise Option is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 11/9/18, and 100 the motion for stay and abeyance is deemed timely; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 99 Connors's pr o se request to extend that same deadline is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 101 the Respondents' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response to 100 Petitioner's Motion for Stay and Abeyance is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that 85 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part: Grounds 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11(1), 11(2), 11(3), 12(A), 13(A), 13(B), and 13(D) are DISMISSED; Grounds 12(1), 13(C), and all claims in ground 11(4) (except the claim of pros ecutorial misconduct for allegedly introducing into evidence Dr. Green's report and testimony without proper qualification) are UNEXHAUSTED.FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner has until October 19, 2018, to do one of the items as listed in this o rder. If petitioner does none of these things by October 19, 2018, this case may be dismissed without further prior notice.FURTHER ORDERED THAT if petitioner chooses to file a motion for a stay and abeyance or seek other appropriate relief, respon dents may respond to his motion as provided in Local Rule 7-2. If he elects to abandon his unexhausted grounds, respondents will have 30 days from the date petitioner serves his declaration of abandonment to file an answer to petitioners remaining gr ounds for relief. The answer must contain all substantive and procedural arguments for all surviving grounds of the petition and comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Proceedings in the United States District Courts under 28 U.S.C. §2254. Petitioner will then have 30 days after service of respondents' answer to file his reply. Status Report due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that 81 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is DENIED as unnecessary. FURTHER ORDERED that 82 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re: 80 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. Respondents have until February 1, 2018, to respond to the amended petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that 25 and 26 Motions to Extend Time are GRANTED. Connors has until November 17, 2017, to file his first-amended petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition. Petitioner must file the petition by July 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 19 Petitioner's motion to stay the proceedings is DENIED; 21 Counsel's motion to withdraw is DENIED; and 18 The second motion for extension of time to file an amended petition is GRANTED. Dows has 45 days to file an amended petition that includes all known grounds for relief (both exhausted and unexhausted). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including December 27, 2016, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Julian R Gregory withdrawn from the case. FURTHER ORDERED that CJA-panel attorney Angela Dows is appointed to represent Connors in this action and all future proceedings in this court relat ing to this matter, including later actions and appeals. FURTHER ORDERED that Dows must enter a notice of appearance by August 17, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that Dows must file an amended petition by October 28, 2016, that includes all known grounds for relief (both exhausted and unexhausted). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Federal Public Defender is released as counsel. Julian Gregory is appointed to represent Connors. Mr. Gregory is instructed to enter a notice of appearance by May 15, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Gregory must file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus by July 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk detach and file 1 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Petitioner's 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. The FPD is appointed to represent petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this Order together with a copy of the Petition on Respondents. Respondents will have until 11/9/15 to file a Notice of Appearance.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's 3 Motion to Extend Time to Amend Petition and 5 Motion for An Emergency Injunction is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connors v. Williams, Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Wayne Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?