Wilk v. Neven et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wilk
Defendant: Cary Leavitt and Dwight Neven
Case Number: 2:2015cv01429
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER VACATING 87 Order and Denying 77 Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the 96 Ninth Circuit's Opinion. The Clerk is directed to reassign the Magistrate Judge and to forward this order to the pro bono liaison. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting Defendants' 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Rule 8 Relief is Denied. Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. Plaintiff's 57 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgme nt is Denied. Defendants' 70 Motion for Leave to File a Response is Denied as moot. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/14/2017.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that 83 Motion for a Case Update Pertaining to Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 84 Motion for Findings and Recommendations Upon the Summary Judgment Matter Before this Court is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the Clerk terminate Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Production of Documents and note on the docket that is was a misfiled document. The Court will not consider it as a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's 45 Motions for an Expedited Trial and 47 Motion for Trial by a Magistrate Judge are Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 04/03/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the Clerk shall strike Plaintiff's 41 Motion re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's 18 first amended complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re whom it does/does not accept service for. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that Defendants shall file their status report on or before 11/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCREENING ORDER. Plaintiff's 11 Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend. Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 15 Motion for an Early Mediation Conference is Denied. Amended Complaint deadline: 30 days from the date of entry of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in this order, this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Complaint form/instructions and 11 Complaint mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilk v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Leavitt
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?