Esprecion v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Jamie KS Esprecion
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01452
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER scheduling Oral Argument re ECF No. 15 Motion for Summary Judgment for 8/25/2016 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re ECF No. 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, giving Plaintiff 7 days to file a surreply. No surreply from Defendant is permitted. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esprecion v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Represented By: Carl R Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie KS Esprecion
Represented By: Christian N Griffin
Represented By: Brian K Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?