Wallace v. Romey et al
Plaintiff: Gary Wallace
Defendant: Thomas D. Dillard Jr., Todd Fasulo, Claudia Romey, Steven B. Wolfson and James Zinser
Case Number: 2:2015cv01474
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff shall have 30 days to submit a request for reinstatement of the case and explain why he has not responded to this Courts Order of March 21, 2017. If no such submission is filed or i f the Court finds the explanation to be unsatisfactory, this dismissal will thereupon be with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/17/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 13 , 14 Plaintiff's Motions to Refile and 15 , 16 Motions for Issuance of Subpoenas are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Reconsider. Plaintiff shall have 45 days to amend his complaint to reassert claims against Fasulo and Dillard. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full 2 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Claudia Romney and Steven Wolfson be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief be granted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Romey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Dillard Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Fasulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Romey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Zinser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?