Hopkins v. MortgageIt, Inc.
Plaintiff: Manzar Hopkins
Defendant: MortgageIt, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01547
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER The settlement conference scheduled for January 19, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. The parties shall have until February 16, 2018, to either file a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, or a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the Court's 25 Order is Vacated. Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Plaintiff's claim for slander of title is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complai nt is Granted. Amended Complaint deadline: 7/15/2016. Failure to file an Amended Complaint by this date shall result in the Court dismissing these claims with prejudice and closing the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response to 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Responses due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Complaint. MortgageIt, Inc. answer due 9/2/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. MortgageIt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manzar Hopkins
Represented By: Robert J. Flummerfelt
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Tullio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIt, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Represented By: Michael R Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?