Perez et al v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Myra Perez and Victor Perez
Defendant: Castro, James Greg Cox, Timothy Filson, Dwight W. Neven, Ronald Oliver, Ramos, Smith and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2015cv01572
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 129 STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Attorney Lee I. Iglody. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)Modified on 4/30/2020 to correct the name of the signing Judge (SLD).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 121 Stipulation to Lift Stay; Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Main Document 107 replaced on 9/20/2017) (SLD).
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 104 Joinder. The court will not take further action with respect to this filing unless it is re-filed as a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Proposed Order Submission filed by Victor Perez that the Warden of Lovelock Correctional Center, (located at 1200 Prison Rd, Lovelock, NV 89419) shall have a room available that will hold five (5) attorneys, the court reporter, the deponent and guard(s) on Friday, May 19 at 10:00 am for the deposition of inmate Brandon Castner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 91 Stipulation to Extend Time re 90 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Cox, Neven, Filson, and Oliver's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re 75 Amended Complaint.( Responses due by 2/1/2017., Replies due by 2/22/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Raynaldo-John Ramos' Request for Exception of Attendance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 33 34 the motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The plaintiffs may file an amended complaint to cure the deficiencies pointed out in this Order, if they have sufficient facts to do so. If an amended complaint is not filed within 21 days of the entry of this Order, the case will be closed and judgment will be entered. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 35 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Documents is GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting in Part Defendants' 32 Motion for Leave to File Confidential Documents. The medical records collected as Exhibit R can be filed under seal. With regard to the personnel records collected as Exhibits K, L, and M, the parties ar e to confer about whether sufficient redactions can be made to those records to protect the confidential information but still disclose non-confidential information in those documents. The parties shall file a joint or separate supplemental briefs on this issue within 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Stipulation to postpone the notice of intent to take default judgment. Status Report due in 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight W. Neven
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Oliver
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Perez
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Perez
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?