Mali v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Andras Mali
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association, Chase Bank USA, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01650
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 38 Stipulation for Extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent a ny aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Bank of America, National Association Only. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond re 1 Complaint. Chase Bank USA, National Association answer due 1/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending deadlines and filing requirements as to BOA are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until December 22, 2015 to respond to 11 Motion to Dismiss, and BOA shall have seven days to reply after the response is filed and served. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation Extending Time for Chase to Respond re 1 Complaint. Chase Bank USA, National Association answer due 12/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Intent to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Proof of service due 12/24/15. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 6 Notice of Settlement Between Andras Mali and Equifax Information Services, LLC. This matter is stayed for 60 days and/or November 23, 2015 as to Defendant Equifax only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Stipulation for Dismissal by 11/23/15. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mali v. Bank of America, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andras Mali
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?